Global Patent Index - EP 0908326 B1

EP 0908326 B1 2001-04-11 - Thermal transfer dye ribbon for luminescent writing

Title (en)

Thermal transfer dye ribbon for luminescent writing

Title (de)

Thermotransferfarbband für lumineszierende Schriftzeichen

Title (fr)

Ruban de colorant pour transfert thermique pour l'écriture luminescente

Publication

EP 0908326 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114543 A

Priority

DE 19744956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908326A1] Thermal transfer tape consists of base film coated on one side with a layer containing luminescent pigment, wax and polymeric wax plasticizer and a second layer containing wax, polymer binder and a non-luminescent pigment with a reflectance peak at the wavelength of the light emitted by the luminescent pigment. Thermal transfer tape comprising a base tape with two superimposed thermally-transferrable layers on one side of the base. The first layer (A) next to the base contains a luminescent pigment (pigment 1), wax(es) with a melting point (m.pt.) of 70-110 degrees C and about 1-22 wt% polymeric wax plasticizer with a glass temperature (Tg) of -30 to +70 degrees C. The second (outer) layer (B) shows a heat of fusion ( DELTA -H) of 10-80 J/g; it contains a non-luminescent pigment (pigment 2) with a reflectance spectrum showing a peak or leading edge in the wavelength range of the light emitted by pigment 1, plus a wax-compatible polymeric binder and 5-30 wt% wax and/or wax-like substance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/06 (2006.01); B41M 5/26 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/385 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/38228 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908326 A1 19990414; EP 0908326 B1 20010411; CA 2250299 A1 19990410; DE 19744956 A1 19990415; DE 19744956 C2 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-07-03 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 59800612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B41M0005380000

- IPC: B41M0005385000

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-27 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 59800612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B41M0005380000

- IPC: B41M0005385000

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110803

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-06-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800612

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000530

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991013

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI