Global Patent Index - EP 0908368 B1

EP 0908368 B1 2000-04-05 - Tilt mechanism

Title (en)

Tilt mechanism

Title (de)

Neigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'inclinaison.

Publication

EP 0908368 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117513 A

Priority

EP 97117513 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908368A1] The inclination device has a drive (31) and an associated transmission mechanism (33,34,35), with a variable transmission ratio, for controlled transverse inclination of the rail vehicle carriage (2) relative to the wheeled chassis (3). The transmission ratio of the transmission mechanism decreases as the angle of inclination of the vehicle carriage from its rest position increases.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Neigevorrichtung zum gleisbogenabhängigen Erzeugen einer Wagenkastenneigung bei Schienenfahrzeugen (1), mit einer Koppelungseinrichtung (15), mit der der Wagenkasten (2) mit einem Fahrgestell (3) beweglich derart verbunden ist, daß der Wagenkasten aus einer im wesentlichen aufrechten Ruhestellung in eine gegenüber dem Fahrgestell geneigte Stellung überführbar ist, und mit einer einen Antrieb (31) und eine Übertragungseinrichtung (33,34,35) aufweisenden Verstelleinrichtung, mit der der Wagenkasten zum Überführen von seiner Ruhestellung in seine geneigte Stellung gegenüber dem Fahrgestell bewegbar ist. Um derartige Neigevorrichtungen kostengünstiger herstellen zu können, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß die Übertragungseinrichtung ein Getriebe mit einer variablen Übersetzung aufweist, wobei die Übersetzung des Getriebes (33,34,35) beim Überführen des Wagenkastens von seiner Ruhestellung in seine geneigte Stellung mit zunehmenden Neigungswinkel des Wagenkastens gegenüber dem Fahrgestell wächst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01M 17/08 (2006.01); B61F 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908368 A1 19990414; EP 0908368 B1 20000405; AT 191407 T 20000415; CA 2249893 A1 19990409; CA 2249893 C 20020514; DE 59701407 D1 20000511; ES 2146947 T3 20000816; JP 3392359 B2 20030331; JP H11198807 A 19990727; US 6244190 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071009

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-11-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031010

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031009

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-10-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-10-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031009

2002-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021010

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146947 T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701407 20000511

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191407 T 20000415

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEMBTNER, ROGER

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEHLIN, BERND

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990324

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980515

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI