Global Patent Index - EP 0908406 B1

EP 0908406 B1 2002-11-27 - Device and method for conveying and switching individually held products

Title (en)

Device and method for conveying and switching individually held products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Fördern und Ablenken von individuell gehaltenen Produkten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour transporter et aiguiller des produits maintenus individuellement

Publication

EP 0908406 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117877 A

Priority

US 94669197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908406A1] A sheet handling system has individual grips for each sheet, or folded sheet, moving along a guide track. Each grip has a pair of gripping jaws to pick up single items. A switching point (61) enables selected grips to be diverted into a reject track (107). These comprise grips holding faulty sheets, misaligned sheets, multiple sheets, no sheets etc. The remaining grips are moved along the main track (106) to the next process station, with the missing gaps closed up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/02; B65H 29/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/02 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B65H 29/02 (2013.01); B65H 2405/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908406 A1 19990414; EP 0908406 B1 20021127; DE 59806424 D1 20030109; US 6007064 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806424

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806424 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010710

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980921

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI