Global Patent Index - EP 0908408 A3

EP 0908408 A3 2000-01-05 - Device and method for combined gathering and binding of sheet-like products

Title (en)

Device and method for combined gathering and binding of sheet-like products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren für das kombinierte Zusammentragen und Binden von bogenförmigen Produkten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour l'assemblage et la reliure combinés de produits en forme de feuilles

Publication

EP 0908408 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116310 A

Priority

US 94651697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908408A2] The collating and binding system for folded sheets has an endless transporter moving under dispensers (9) for the folded sheets and with a number of collating stations (12) under the transporter, each with an upper holding position (12.1) in which the folded sheets (17) are collected. When the full set of sheets has been collected the holding station tilts and drops the collated stack into a binding station (12.2), which moves with the collator. The bound stack is dropped off and the process is repeated. The collating position and the binding position are separated by a transfer zone. A curved wall (44) forms the bottom of the collator when the upper position is in a tilted setting. The stack is dropped into the binder by tilting the collator into the vertical position. This provides a simple handling process with a large throughput.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/02; B42C 1/12; B65H 39/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/045 (2006.01); B42C 1/12 (2006.01); B65H 31/28 (2006.01); B65H 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/02 (2013.01); B42C 1/12 (2013.01); B65H 31/3009 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42261 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4321 (2013.01); B65H 2405/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839312 A1 19990408; CN 1093496 C 20021030; CN 1213640 A 19990414; DE 59806171 D1 20021212; EP 0908408 A2 19990414; EP 0908408 A3 20000105; EP 0908408 B1 20021106; HK 1018608 A1 20030627; JP 4046868 B2 20080213; JP H11189366 A 19990713; US 5921538 A 19990713

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806171

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-03-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100827

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-05-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021106

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806171 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 39/02 A, 7B 42C 1/12 B, 7B 65H 39/055 B

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980828

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI