Global Patent Index - EP 0908560 B1

EP 0908560 B1 2002-11-20 - Coated roll printing paper suitable for printing with cold-set inks

Title (en)

Coated roll printing paper suitable for printing with cold-set inks

Title (de)

Gestrichenes Rollendruckpapier mit Eignung für das Bedrucken mit Coldset-Farben

Title (fr)

Papier d'impression couché et enroulé, apte à l'impression avec des encres de type coldset

Publication

EP 0908560 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118888 A

Priority

DE 19745082 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908560A1] A coated printing paper roll (I) for printing with cold set inks in coldset-offset rotary printing processes. The process comprises a raw paper as support, containing paper fibres and mineral fillers and a coating pigment and binding agent containing coating, has the following properties: (a) penetration test value of 80-25, preferably 70-30 % after 1 second using a dynamic penetration apparatus DPM 27 (emco-Test); (b) a colour loss test value of 1.1-0.25, preferably 0.8-0.3; (c) Bekk smoothness of 250-600 sec; and (d) Lehmann gloss value of at least 25% at 75 degrees .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 19/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/06 (2006.01); B32B 29/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); D21H 19/36 (2006.01); D21H 19/38 (2006.01); D21H 19/44 (2006.01); D21H 21/14 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); D21H 11/14 (2006.01); D21H 19/40 (2006.01); D21H 19/42 (2006.01); D21H 19/50 (2006.01); D21H 19/52 (2006.01); D21H 19/54 (2006.01); D21H 19/58 (2006.01); D21H 19/60 (2006.01); D21H 21/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/36 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5236 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01); D21H 11/14 (2013.01); D21H 19/385 (2013.01); D21H 19/40 (2013.01); D21H 19/42 (2013.01); D21H 19/50 (2013.01); D21H 19/52 (2013.01); D21H 19/54 (2013.01); D21H 19/58 (2013.01); D21H 19/60 (2013.01); D21H 21/52 (2013.01); Y10T 428/27 (2013.01); Y10T 428/273 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908560 A1 19990414; EP 0908560 B1 20021120; AT 228187 T 20021215; DE 19745082 A1 19990415; DK 0908560 T3 20021216; ES 2186074 T3 20030501; JP 3050381 B2 20000612; JP H11200293 A 19990727; NO 325126 B1 20080204; NO 984678 A 19990412; NO 984678 D0 19981007; NZ 332227 A 20000228; PT 908560 E 20030430; US 6197155 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111007

2013-05-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130530

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111006

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111006

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111006

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806340

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111006

2012-05-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAINDL PAPIER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101006

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-04-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186074 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400298

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806340 20030102

2002-12-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228187 T 20021215

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAINDL PAPIER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COATED ROLL PRINTING PAPER SUITABLE FOR PRINTING WITH COLD-SET INKS

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990629

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI