Global Patent Index - EP 0908566 B1

EP 0908566 B1 2002-11-27 - Wall carrier plate for sanitary installations

Title (en)

Wall carrier plate for sanitary installations

Title (de)

Wandscheibe für Sanitärinstallationen

Title (fr)

Disque de montage pour installations sanitaires

Publication

EP 0908566 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118796 A

Priority

DE 19745194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908566A1] A wall plate (1) for fixing sanitary installations, comprises a soft, sound damping plastics and at least two radially arranged grooves (7) which cross each other. The grooves accommodate fixing screws for the sanitary installations. The wall plate preferably consists of polypropylene and the grooves have a V-shaped cross-section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/02; E03C 1/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/02 (2006.01); E03C 1/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/021 (2013.01); E03C 1/042 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5053274 A 19911001 - JONAS ARTHUR E [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908566 A1 19990414; EP 0908566 B1 20021127; AT 228598 T 20021215; DE 19745194 A1 19990506; DE 19745194 C2 19990916; ES 2186073 T3 20030501

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041006

2005-10-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041005

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2004-10-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-10-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FISCHERWERKE ARTUR *FISCHER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031007

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186073 T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-02-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806425 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228598 T 20021215

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010510

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI