Global Patent Index - EP 0908572 A3

EP 0908572 A3 2000-10-11 - Roofing tile

Title (en)

Roofing tile

Title (de)

Flachdachpfanne

Title (fr)

Tuile mécanique

Publication

EP 0908572 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118657 A

Priority

DE 29717842 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908572A2] Ribs and block protrusions in the bottom corner regions on the underside of the tile engage with the two different level planes in the top corner regions on the top side of the tile. The tile (1) has two cut-out sections in each of the top and bottom joint edge corners (29). These corner sections contain two different planes (296, 298), which are present on the top side of the tile at the top joint edge corners, and on the bottom side of the tile at the bottom joint edge corners. The top plane (296) present in the top joint edge corner (29) is adjacent to a recessed bottom plane (298) oriented towards a lower region (299) of the cut-out section in the corner. The next overlapping tile has its bottom joint edge covering the top plane, this bottom joint edge region including a rib at the bottom end of the top plane in the bottom joint edge corner. A block protrusion at the bottom end of the bottom plane in this bottom joint edge corner is laid on top of the bottom plane in the top joint edge corner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717842 U1 19990204; AT 263293 T 20040415; EP 0908572 A2 19990414; EP 0908572 A3 20001011; EP 0908572 B1 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 263293 T

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811087

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CREATON AG

- Free text: CREATON AG#DILLINGER STRASSE 60#86637 WERTINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CREATON AG#DILLINGER STRASSE 60#86637 WERTINGEN (DE)

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100817

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CREATON AG

- Free text: HERBERT KESSLER#IN DER MULDE 57A#85410 HAAG A.D. AMPER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CREATON AG#DILLINGER STRASSE 60#86637 WERTINGEN (DE)

2009-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HERBERT KESSLER

- Free text: LUDOWICI, MICHAEL CHRISTIAN#JOSEF WIESBERGERSTRASSE 5-7#D-85540 HAAR (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HERBERT KESSLER#IN DER MULDE 57A#85410 HAAG A.D. AMPER (DE)

2007-04-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-03-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ERLUS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811087 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI