Global Patent Index - EP 0908573 A3

EP 0908573 A3 2000-10-04 - Sanitizing set, in particular for asbestos-cement roofs

Title (en)

Sanitizing set, in particular for asbestos-cement roofs

Title (de)

Bausatz zur Sanierung von insbesondere mit Wellasbestzementplatten eingedeckten Dächern

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'assainissement, en particulier pour des toits en amiante-ciment

Publication

EP 0908573 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118788 A

Priority

DE 19744114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908573A2] A dust free method for covering a corrugated asbestos roof has U-profile strips (3) which are laid over some of the corrugated ridges and onto which can be fitted new roofing panels. The bottom lips of the U-strips are turned over to prevent scraping the asbestos. The strips are secured by clips which grip under the existing fasteners (4) of the asbestos roof, with holes in the strips to align over the fasteners. Other clips are fitted to bridging strips (11) which are laid over the adjoining ends of two profiled strips spaced by an amount equal to the width of the fasteners. Alternately adjoining strips are overlapped and secured by fasteners.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/36 (2006.01); E04G 23/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/3608 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908573 A2 19990414; EP 0908573 A3 20001004; DE 19744114 C1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI