Global Patent Index - EP 0908584 A3

EP 0908584 A3 2000-03-29 - Garage with several parking floors

Title (en)

Garage with several parking floors

Title (de)

Parkeinrichtung mit mehreren Parkebenen

Title (fr)

Garage à plusieurs niveaux de stationement

Publication

EP 0908584 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118826 A

Priority

DE 29717848 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908584A2] The parking compartments at least on one outside have a closed outer wall and in the central support structure a transport device is installed, by which vehicles can be moved into the compartments from a starting position and also back to the starting position again. The central support structure (1) comprises several individual, identical portal frames (2) one behind the other, made of roller profiles of high rigidity. The individual frames are firmly clamped in floor foundations (3) and are spaced apart corresponding to the parking compartment width. For formation of the individual compartments (4), right-angled, outwardly extending console supports (6,6') are fixed, the length of which corresponds to the depth of the parking compartment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717848 U1 19981119; EP 0908584 A2 19990414; EP 0908584 A3 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030505

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI