Global Patent Index - EP 0908585 A3

EP 0908585 A3 2002-09-18 - Fitting with a lockable handle for windows, doors, or similar

Title (en)

Fitting with a lockable handle for windows, doors, or similar

Title (de)

Beschlag mit einer verriegelbaren Handhabe für Fenster, Türen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ferrure avec une poignée verrouillable pour des fenêtres, des portes ou similaires

Publication

EP 0908585 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117069 A

Priority

DE 19744141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19744141C1] The handle has a plate fixed to the door leaf and a handle mounted on the plate to actuate a lock. The bolt for taking the different locking positions is parallel to the rotary axis of the handle. The bolt (26) can rotate to at least one locking position with a defined rotational movement, engaging with a stop (44) mounted with respect to the lock plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 13/10; E05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/106 (2013.01); E05C 9/066 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01); E05C 9/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19744141 C1 19990304; EP 0908585 A2 19990414; EP 0908585 A3 20020918; EP 0908585 B1 20041027; HU 220057 B 20011028; HU 9802248 A1 19990928; HU 9802248 D0 19981228

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59812169

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120909

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120909

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROTO FRANK A.G.

- Effective date: 20120930

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110909

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812169 P 20041202

2004-12-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030104

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI