Global Patent Index - EP 0908589 A3

EP 0908589 A3 2001-12-12 - Access system

Title (en)

Access system

Title (de)

Zugangssystem

Title (fr)

Système d'accés

Publication

EP 0908589 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118689 A

Priority

  • AU PO973097 A
  • AU 7193098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908589A2] The access system (2) uses a base station (6) within the automobile passenger space (8) and an electronic key (4) for transmission of a communication protocol with the base station, to provide selective access to the passenger space by activation and deactivation of a passive access system. The operation of the access system via the electronic key may be limited, for limiting the access to the passenger space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00111 (2013.01); G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00261 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00507 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); G07C 2209/04 (2013.01); G07C 2209/08 (2013.01); G07C 2209/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908589 A2 19990414; EP 0908589 A3 20011212; EP 0908589 B1 20080227; AU 7193098 A 19990429; AU 739172 B2 20011004; DE 59814178 D1 20080410; ES 2299197 T3 20080516

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101003

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101002

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101003

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101002

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101002

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2008-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2299197 T3

2008-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814178 P 20080410

2008-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2008-02-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040702

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PAVATICH, GIANFRANCO

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BONNET, NICHOLAS JAMES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 49/00 A, 7G 07C 9/00 B

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI