Global patent index - EP 0908594 A3

EP 0908594 A3 2001-01-31 - Device for monitoring a door opening region

Title (en)

Device for monitoring a door opening region

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Überwachung eines Türöffnungsbereiches

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance d'une zone d'ouverture d'une porte

Publication

EP 0908594 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890291 A

Priority

AT 172497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908594A2] The door opening monitoring device has a movable system element (4) attached to the door panel and a stationary system element (5) in the path of movement of the door panel. These are coupled via respective signal paths for provision of the operating energy and for transmission of monitoring signals from at least one sensor incorporated in the door panel in opposite directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/00; B66B 13/26; E05F 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/42 (2013.01); E05F 15/43 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/656 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/66 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908594 A2 19990414; EP 0908594 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI