Global Patent Index - EP 0908600 A3

EP 0908600 A3 2000-12-20 - Formation testing apparatus

Title (en)

Formation testing apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung einer Formation

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'essai de formations

Publication

EP 0908600 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308218 A

Priority

US 94780597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908600A2] A formation testing apparatus (10) for use within a wellbore (12). The apparatus (10) comprises a first fluid passage (22) for receiving fluid therein from a formation (14) intersecting the wellbore (12). A first fluid pressure sensor (26) is interconnected to the first fluid passage (22). A filter (38) is coupled to the first pressure sensor (26). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/06; E21B 47/18; E21B 49/08; E21B 49/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/124 (2006.01); E21B 47/06 (2012.01); E21B 47/18 (2012.01); E21B 49/08 (2006.01); E21B 49/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 49/088 (2013.01); E21B 33/1243 (2013.01); E21B 47/06 (2013.01); E21B 47/18 (2013.01); E21B 49/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908600 A2 19990414; EP 0908600 A3 20001220; NO 984694 A 19990412; NO 984694 D0 19981008

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-02-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011206

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK FR GB NL

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB NL

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI