Global Patent Index - EP 0908624 B1

EP 0908624 B1 2001-12-12 - Displacement control valve for use in a variable displacement compressor

Title (en)

Displacement control valve for use in a variable displacement compressor

Title (de)

Ventil zur Hubregelung zur Verwendung in einem Kompressor mit veränderlicher Verdrängung

Title (fr)

Soupape de contrôle de déplacement pour utilisation dans un compresseur à capacité variable

Publication

EP 0908624 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98118877 A

Priority

JP 27297297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908624A2] In a displacement control valve (10) for use in a variable displacement compressor, a valve casing (11) defines a communication passage (17) for communicating a discharge chamber (52) with a crank chamber (43) to conduct gas from the discharge chamber to the crank chamber. A valve member (18) is coupled to said communication passage and movable between a open position and a close position in a predetermined direction. The valve member is biased towards the open position on expansion of a pressure sensitive member (12) which causes the expansion in the predetermined direction in response to a pressure in at least one of the suction chamber and the crank chamber. The pressure sensitive member is movable in relation to the valve casing in the predetermined direction. A spring (14) urges the pressure sensitive member in the predetermined direction to make the pressure sensitive member urge the valve member towards the open position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/06 (2006.01); F04B 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1804 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1813 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1827 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1854 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1859 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908624 A2 19990414; EP 0908624 A3 19990908; EP 0908624 B1 20011212; DE 69802885 D1 20020124; DE 69802885 T2 20020801; JP 3862380 B2 20061227; JP H11107930 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802885

2016-04-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION, LSESAKI-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANDEN CORP., ISESAKI, GUNMA, JP

- Document: DE 69802885

2016-04-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69802885

- Representative's name: PRUEFER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802885 20020124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000210

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI