Global patent index - EP 0908652 A3

EP 0908652 A3 2000-09-20 - Valved device with automatic and/or manual actuation for quickly inflating life-jackets or other items

Title (en)

Valved device with automatic and/or manual actuation for quickly inflating life-jackets or other items

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit Ventil mit automatischer und/oder manueller Betätigung zum schnellen Auffblasen von Rettungswesten oder anderen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif à soupape avec actionnement automatique et/ou manuel pour le gonflement rapide de gilets de sauvetage ou d'autres objets

Publication

EP 0908652 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118327 A

Priority

IT FO970024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908652A2] A valved device with automatic and/or manual actuation, for quickly inflating life-jackets or other items, comprising a main body (A) having a flat base (1) for fixing to the fabric of a life-jacket, said jacket being provided with a hole. The flat base (1) perimetrically delimits a recess (2), in said main body (A), into which an opening (3) leads. The opening (3) is provided in a cylindrical seat (4) for the sliding of first elements (C,10) meant to tear the closure of a bottle of compressed air or gases and of second elements (F,G,H) which are coaxial to said first elements (C,10) and subsequently keep the life-jacket inflated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 15/20; B63C 9/19; F16K 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/19 (2006.01); F16K 15/06 (2006.01); F16K 15/20 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B63C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/19 (2013.01); B63C 9/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908652 A2 19990414; EP 0908652 A3 20000920; IT 1304337 B1 20010315; IT FO970024 A1 19990411; IT FO970024 A3 19990412; IT FO970024 D0 19971010

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 16K 15/20 A, 7F 16K 15/06 B, 7B 63C 9/19 B, 7B 63C 9/24 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI