Global Patent Index - EP 0908657 B1

EP 0908657 B1 2001-05-23 - Pipe swaging device with hydraulic transmission

Title (en)

Pipe swaging device with hydraulic transmission

Title (de)

Rohrschmiedegerät mit hydraulischem Antrieb

Title (fr)

Machine à rétreindre de tuyaux à transmission hydraulique

Publication

EP 0908657 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98118890 A

Priority

IT MI972312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908657A1] A conventional swaging gripper (90) with two jaws (92) can be applied to the device (82) for swaging metal pipes (100). The closure movement of the jaws (92) which squeeze the pipe (100) is achieved by a hydraulic transmission comprising: a cylinder (44) within which a rod (52) is movable in both directions, one end of the rod emerging from the cylinder (44) through a suitable sealed aperture and to its other end there being coaxially fixed a sealed piston (54) which divides the interior of the cylinder (44) into a first chamber (42) and a second chamber (58) both containing an incompressible liquid, the outer end of the rod carrying means (80) for opening the jaws (92) of the pipe swaging gripper (90), applicable to the pipe swaging device (82), as a result of volume increase of the first chamber (42); a reservoir (34) also containing said incompressible liquid, the reservoir shell having a part (74) deformable elastically within a predetermined range as a result of variation in the liquid quantity within the reservoir (34); a plunger pump (30) to withdraw the liquid contained in the reservoir (34) and to feed it under pressure into the first chamber (42) of the cylinder (44) via a first conduit (36, 46, 48); a second conduit (72) which connects the second chamber (58) of the cylinder (44) to the reservoir (34); a third conduit (53) which connects the first chamber (42) to the reservoir (34) by by-passing the pump (30); manually operable shut-off means (51, 49) provided in the third conduit (53); and elastic return means (55) for returning the rod (52) into the position corresponding to minimum volume of the first chamber (42) of the cylinder (44) when the shut-off means (51, 49) in the third conduit (53) are open. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 13/14; B21D 39/04; H01R 43/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01); B25B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2013.01); B25B 27/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908657 A1 19990414; EP 0908657 B1 20010523; AT 201491 T 20010615; DE 69800825 D1 20010628; DE 69800825 T2 20010927; ES 2157108 T3 20010801; IT 1295321 B1 19990504; IT MI972312 A1 19990414

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141007

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141006

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141007

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141006

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141006

2015-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201491 T

- Effective date: 20141006

2015-06-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800825

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131016

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131002

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131017

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157108 T3

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800825 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201491 T 20010615

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991228

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990721

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI