Global Patent Index - EP 0908681 A3

EP 0908681 A3 2001-03-21 - Warm air heater

Title (en)

Warm air heater

Title (de)

Warmluft-Heizeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de chauffage à air chaud

Publication

EP 0908681 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810862 A

Priority

CH 235997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908681A2] Heat is stored by stones arranged around the stove, and a steady circulation of hot air is achieved using a fan in the pedestal to blow air up through chambers next to the stones, around the smoke trap, and back through the chambers towards the fan intake slot. The heater includes a fire grate (2), a door for the solid fuel burning stove, and a heat exchanger for generating hot air. A metal insert (1) surrounding the fireplace (3) is used to form the stove and smoke trap (6). The stove cladding is formed by stones (12, 12) with a heat storage capacity, air chambers being created between the stones and the stove. Air guide plates (18) are situated in the smoke trap region. A radial fan housed inside the fireplace pedestal (8) is used to generate a flow of hot air up through at least one of the air chambers, around the outside of the smoke trap and back through at least one more air chamber in the pedestal to a fan intake slot (11). Independent claims are also included for: (a) the heating process utilizing the above arrangement; and (b) a mounting arrangement for the heat storage stones, using a bow frame fixed to a stone adjoining two abutting stones, which has a flat middle region received by a slot in the stone, and two protruding arms for supporting the abutting stones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/188

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/1885 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908681 A2 19990414; EP 0908681 A3 20010321; CH 692754 A5 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI