Global patent index - EP 0908693 A3

EP 0908693 A3 2000-05-03 - Radiator

Title (en)

Radiator

Title (de)

Heizkörper

Title (fr)

Radiateur

Publication

EP 0908693 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810962 A

Priority

  • DE 29717950 U
  • DE 29718876 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908693A2] The radiator has a part through which a heat-carrying medium flows and a part taking away this heat. The flow part can be connected to tubes. It includes a flat panel (12) containing flow channels (14). There are clamping elements on at least one outer surface of the panel for sheet inserts (36) used to take away the heat. The flat panel and/or the sheet inserts may be made of extruded strips of a non-ferrous metal alloy. The panel may have two walls (16,17) with parallel cross walls forming the flow channels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 3/06; F28D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0246 (2013.01); F28F 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908693 A2 19990414; EP 0908693 A3 20000503

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030530

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI