Global Patent Index - EP 0908861 A3

EP 0908861 A3 2000-08-23 - Method for transmitting traffic information

Title (en)

Method for transmitting traffic information

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ermittlung von Verkehrsinformationen

Title (fr)

Procédé de transmission d'information sur le trafic

Publication

EP 0908861 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117135 A

Priority

DE 19740693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908861A2] The method involves forming local detection cross-sections using fixed detectors which detect traffic-related measurement values. The values are pre-processed by local computers and standardised to a defined data format, aggregated and wirelessly passed to a superior data processing system. The inputs to the processing procedure are at least traffic speed and volume. The output data can be at least the travel time and traffic density at a detection cross-section. The data can be finally processed using an expanded complex processing technique to determine traffic information related to routes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9411839 A1 19940526 - OLSSON KJELL [SE]
  • [A] US 5539645 A 19960723 - MANDHYAN INDUR B [US], et al
  • [A] DE 19521919 A1 19960530 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
  • [A] IOKIBE T ET AL: "TRAFFIC PREDICTION METHOD BY FUZZY LOGIC", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. CONF. 2, 1993, pages 673 - 678, XP000371490, ISBN: 0-7803-0614-7

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908861 A2 19990414; EP 0908861 A3 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI