Global Patent Index - EP 0908910 B1

EP 0908910 B1 2000-08-23 - Thermally actuated switching device with a calibration nut

Title (en)

Thermally actuated switching device with a calibration nut

Title (de)

Ein wärmebetätigter Schalter, mit einer kalibrierenden Mutter

Title (fr)

Un dispositif commutateur thermiquement actionné, avec un écrou de calibrage

Publication

EP 0908910 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98500213 A

Priority

NL 1007227 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908910A1] A thermally actuated switching device, comprising a base body (2), a electric switch (10), a spring-mounted actuating arm (3) for actuating the switch (10), a setting spindle (9) to set an operating temperature, which interacts with the actuating arm (3), and a calibration nut (15) for calibration of the switch, which is threaded on the spindle (9) and can be rotated with friction while the spindle is kept gripped against rotation. The calibration nut (15) is designed as a riveted nut (15), accommodated in a bore (16) in the base body (2), in such a way that it does not rotate with the spindle when the spindle is turned to set an operating temperature. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 35/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/26 (2013.01); H01H 35/2635 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908910 A1 19990414; EP 0908910 B1 20000823; DE 69800269 D1 20000928; DE 69800269 T2 20010315; ES 2150812 T3 20001201; NL 1007227 A1 19990415; NL 1007227 C2 19990504

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051002

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031002

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2002-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150812 T3

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800269 20000928

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990217

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI