Global Patent Index - EP 0908912 A3

EP 0908912 A3 2000-03-15 - Float switch

Title (en)

Float switch

Title (de)

Schwimmerschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à flotteur

Publication

EP 0908912 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118949 A

Priority

DE 19745184 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908912A2] The float switch has a magnetic (10) positioned in dependence on the liquid level within a container, via a float, for cooperation with a second magnet (15) on the opposite side of the non-magnetic wall. The non-magnetic wall is moved for operation of a switch operating element (16) for a pump motor switch (17), for disconnecting the pump upon reaching a minimum liquid level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 36/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 36/02 (2006.01); H01H 36/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 36/02 (2013.01); H01H 36/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908912 A2 19990414; EP 0908912 A3 20000315; DE 19745184 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030501

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI