Global patent index - EP 0908917 A3

EP 0908917 A3 2000-03-22 - Secondary emission coating for photomultiplier tubes

Title (en)

Secondary emission coating for photomultiplier tubes

Title (de)

Sekundäremissionsbechichtung für Vervielfacherröhren

Title (fr)

Revêtement à émission secondaire pour tube photomultiplicateur

Publication

EP 0908917 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308254 A

Priority

US 94749797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908917A2] A p-doped diamond film deposited upon a substrate is used to make exceptionally stable high current secondary electron emitters for photomultiplier tube dynodes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 1/32; H01J 43/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/32 (2006.01); H01J 43/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 43/10 (2013.01); H01J 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] US 5619091 A 19970408 - ANDERSON DAVID F [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0413482 A2 19910220 - GALILEO ELECTRO OPTICS CORP [US]
  • [X] SHIH A ET AL: "SECONDARY ELECTRON EMISSION FROM DIAMOND SURFACES", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 82, no. 4, 15 August 1997 (1997-08-15), pages 1860 - 1867, XP000749012, ISSN: 0021-8979
  • [X] KAMIYA T ET AL: "SECONDARY ELECTRON EMISSION FROM BORON-DOPED DIAMOND UNDER ION IMPACT: APPLICATIONS IN SINGLE-ION DETECTION", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 71, no. 13, 29 September 1997 (1997-09-29), pages 1875 - 1877, XP000725819, ISSN: 0003-6951

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908917 A2 19990414; EP 0908917 A3 20000322; EP 0908917 B1 20050420; DE 69829816 D1 20050525; DE 69829816 T2 20060126

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69829816

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020626

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI