Global patent index - EP 0908973 A3

EP 0908973 A3 2000-07-12 - A replaceable surge protective plug

Title (en)

A replaceable surge protective plug

Title (de)

Auswechselbarer Überspannungsgeschützter Stecker

Title (fr)

Fiche remplaçable avec protection contre des surtensions

Publication

EP 0908973 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98112525 A

Priority

US 94454897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0908973A2] Disclosed is a replaceable surge protective plug for an electric appliance or equipment and mainly including a main body in which a surge protecting means and an LED circuit are arranged. A set of pins are provided at a bottom portion of the main body for inserting into a power socket. The main body includes a removable bottom cover for access of three connection terminals in the main body. A conductor including three connecting lines is connected to the main body by separately connecting the lines to the terminals. The surge protective means may absorb damaging surge and thereby protects the electric appliance or equipment connected to the plug from being damaged by the surge. When the surge protective means in the plug is no longer workable, the LED shall extinguishes to remind a consumer to open the bottom cover and disconnect the conductor from the main body, so that a main body with good surge protective means can be used to replace the old one. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/66; H02H 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6666 (2013.01); H01R 13/6641 (2013.01); H01R 13/6691 (2013.01); H01R 13/7175 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0908973 A2 19990414; EP 0908973 A3 20000712

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1019516

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041113

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030626

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI