EP 0909037 A4 20001122 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COMPRESSING AND EXPANDING DATA PATTERN
Title (en)
METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COMPRESSING AND EXPANDING DATA PATTERN
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMPRESSION UND DEKOMPRESSION VON DATENMUSTERN
Title (fr)
PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION ET DE DECOMPRESSION DE CONFIGURATION BINAIRE
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 9801273 W 19980324
- JP 7029397 A 19970324
- JP 9022597 A 19970324
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0909037A1] A method by which a test pattern to be applied onto an IC for testing can be compressed efficiently. The method comprises determining the number phi of data transitions of the pattern at every pin of the IC and the entropy H of the data, distributing the test pattern among a block wherein the phi is smaller than a threshold phi M( phi < phi M), a block wherein the phi is larger than the threshold phi M( phi > phi M) and the H is larger than a threshold HM(H<HM), and a block wherein the H is larger than the threshold HM(H>HM)(411), compressing the block wherein phi < phi M by the run-length compressing method, compressing the block wherein phi > phi M and H<HM by the run-length compressing method after Burrows Wheeler conversion, and compressing the block wherein H>HM by the LZ compressing method.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G01R 31/3183 (2006.01); G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H03M 7/30 (2006.01); H03M 7/40 (2006.01); H03M 7/46 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
G01R 31/318307 (2013.01 - EP); G01R 31/318335 (2013.01 - EP); G01R 31/318371 (2013.01 - EP); G06T 9/005 (2013.01 - EP); H03M 7/30 (2013.01 - KR); H03M 7/3084 (2013.01 - EP); H03M 7/3088 (2013.01 - EP); H03M 7/40 (2013.01 - EP); H03M 7/46 (2013.01 - EP KR)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5467087 A 19951114 - CHU KE-CHIANG [US]
- [X] US 5535311 A 19960709 - ZIMMERMAN GARY [US]
- [A] US 3787669 A 19740122 - MUEHLDORF E
- [X] PANOS NASIOPOULOS ET AL: "ADAPTIVE COMPRESSION CODING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 39, no. 8, 1 August 1991 (1991-08-01), pages 1245 - 1254, XP000264286, ISSN: 0090-6778
- [A] BURROWS M ET AL: "A BLOCK-SORTING LOSSLESS DATA COMPRESSION ALGORITHM", SRC RESEARCH REPORT,XX,XX, 10 May 1994 (1994-05-10), pages 1 - 18, XP000646918
- [PX] TILGNER M ET AL: "Recursive block structured data compression", PROCEEDINGS DCC '97. DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE (CAT. NO.97TB100108), PROCEEDINGS DCC '97. DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, SNOWBIRD, UT, USA, 25-27 MARCH 1997, 1997, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, pages 471, XP002147470, ISBN: 0-8186-7761-9
- [PX] YAMAGUCHI T ET AL: "An efficient method for compressing test data", PROCEEDINGS. INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE 1997 (IEEE CAT. NO.97CH36126), PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE 1997, WASHINGTON, DC, USA, 1-6 NOV. 1997, 1997, Washington, DC, USA, Int. Test Conference, USA, pages 79 - 88, XP000946220, ISBN: 0-7803-4209-7
- See references of WO 9843359A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0909037 A1 19990414; EP 0909037 A4 20001122; IL 127063 A0 19990922; JP 3377217 B2 20030217; KR 100341211 B1 20020822; KR 20000010935 A 20000225; TW 358165 B 19990511; WO 9843359 A1 19981001
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98909841 A 19980324; IL 12706398 A 19980324; JP 54543498 A 19980324; JP 9801273 W 19980324; KR 19980709083 A 19981111; TW 87104407 A 19980324