Global Patent Index - EP 0909113 A3

EP 0909113 A3 2000-07-19 - In-the-ear hearing aid

Title (en)

In-the-ear hearing aid

Title (de)

Im-Ohr-Hörgerät

Title (fr)

Prothèse auditive intra-auriculaire

Publication

EP 0909113 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117967 A

Priority

DE 19745101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909113A2] The hearing aid (1) has a charging circuit for recharging an electrical energy store (3) upon cooperation with a charging circuit incorporated in a recharging case in which the hearing aid is inserted. The charging circuits incorporated in the hearing aid and the charging case are inductively coupled via cooperating coils (11), that within the hearing aid enclosing the electrical energy store.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01); H04R 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/554 (2013.01); H04R 2225/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909113 A2 19990414; EP 0909113 A3 20000719; DE 19745101 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010120

2001-05-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI