Global patent index - EP 0909136 B1

EP 0909136 B1 2000-12-27 - SEAT, SQUAB OR COUCH UPHOLSTERY

Title (en)

SEAT, SQUAB OR COUCH UPHOLSTERY

Title (de)

SITZ,LEHNEN ODER LIEGENPOLSTERUNG

Title (fr)

CAPITONNAGE POUR SIEGE, DOSSIER OU LIT DE REPOS

Publication

EP 0909136 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97924943 A

Priority

  • DE 19622932 A
  • DE 19634430 A
  • EP 9702419 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6109688A] PCT No. PCT/EP97/02419 Sec. 371 Date Dec. 7, 1998 Sec. 102(e) Date Dec. 7, 1998 PCT Filed May 12, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO97/47220 PCT Pub. Date Dec. 18, 1997Upholstery for a seat, rest or couch. The upholstery includes internal channels through which draining air may flow. Valve means that open under load or compression control air flow through the channels. The flow of draining air is increased automatically or given a desired flow distribution by the surface area pressure controlled by a seated person. The cross sections of the valve means and the channels may be designed so that even a very small pressure difference and correspondingly little energy expenditure will provide a satisfactory air flow rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/24 (2006.01); A47C 7/74 (2006.01); A47C 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/744 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

US 6109688 A 20000829; BR 9709663 A 20000509; DE 19634430 A1 19971211; DE 59702823 D1 20010201; EP 0909136 A1 19990421; EP 0909136 B1 20001227; ES 2152675 T3 20010201; JP 2000512175 A 20000919; WO 9747220 A1 19971218

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-05-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-06-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010604

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152675

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2000-12-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000316

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981124

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI PT