Global Patent Index - EP 0909138 A4

EP 0909138 A4 2002-09-25 - GARMENT HANGER

Title (en)

GARMENT HANGER

Title (de)

KLEIDERBÜGEL

Title (fr)

CINTRE PORTE-VETEMENT

Publication

EP 0909138 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97922617 A

Priority

  • US 9707434 W
  • US 67522896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800051A2] A molded plastic garment hanger, as is widely used for the purpose of shipping and displaying garments, comprising a unitary plastic central hook and arms extending in opposite directions from the base of the central hook to facilitate a garment to be suspended therefrom by garment clips. The garment clips enable the attachment of various kinds of garments thereto, such as underwear, slips, brassieres, swimwear, multiple garments, and the like. The garment hanger has an improved garment retaining clip wherein as a garment is inserted into the garment retaining clip, the garment receiving channel of the clip first opens to allow the garment to enter, and then closes to securely retain the garment and to prevent it from becoming accidentally dislodged therefrom. The garment hanger also has an improved panty retaining clip having an inward slant defined by a receiving channel of the panty retaining clip. As a panty waist band is inserted fully into the panty retaining clip, the panty waist band moves radially inwardly towards the center of the garment hanger, which means that, after a panty waist band is inserted fully into the panty retaining clip, the panty waist band shrinks at each end of the garment hanger. Accordingly, the panty waist band must be expanded or stretched at each end of the garment hanger to remove the panty from the panty retaining clip, which makes accidental dislodgement of the garment from the garment clip a virtual impossibility.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9800051A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800051 A2 19980108; WO 9800051 A3 19980226; AU 2824297 A 19980121; AU 725125 B2 20001005; BR 9710096 A 19991207; CA 2258296 A1 19980108; CN 1149044 C 20040512; CN 1228684 A 19990915; DE 69730216 D1 20040916; DE 69730216 T2 20041230; EP 0909138 A2 19990421; EP 0909138 A4 20020925; EP 0909138 B1 20040811; EP 1452115 A2 20040901; EP 1452115 A3 20041124; EP 2047777 A2 20090415; HK 1020163 A1 20050311; IL 127726 A 20020814; IL 127726 D0 19991028; NZ 333448 A 20000929; TR 199802785 T2 19990322; ZA 9705817 B 19980218

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080502

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080502

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070702

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-11 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1020163

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730216 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOULDSON,STANLEY F.

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981230

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB