Global Patent Index - EP 0909311 A4

EP 0909311 A4 2001-02-28 - POST CLEAN TREATMENT

Title (en)

POST CLEAN TREATMENT

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSNACHBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT POST-NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0909311 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98906398 A

Priority

  • US 9802794 W
  • US 80191197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836045A1] A composition for removal of chemical residues from metal or dielectric surfaces or for chemical mechanical polishing of a copper surface is an aqueous solution with a pH between about 3.5 and about 7. The composition contains a monofunctional, difunctional or trifunctional organic acid and a buffering amount of a quaternary amine, ammonium hydroxide, hydroxylamine, hydroxylamine salt, hydrazine or hydrazine salt base. A method in accordance with the invention for removal of chemical residues from a metal or dielectric surface comprises contacting the metal or dielectric surface with the above composition for a time sufficient to remove the chemical residues. A method in accordance with the invention for chemical mechanical polishing of a copper surface comprises applying the above composition to the copper surface, and polishing the surface in the presence of the composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/18; B08B 3/08; C11D 3/04; C11D 3/30; C11D 3/44; C11D 7/06; C11D 7/26; C11D 7/28; C11D 7/32; C23F 3/06; C23G 1/00; H01L 21/3105; H01L 21/321; H01L 21/3213

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/08 (2006.01); B24B 37/04 (2012.01); C09D 9/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/43 (2006.01); C11D 7/06 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/50 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C23F 3/06 (2006.01); C23G 1/00 (2006.01); C23G 1/10 (2006.01); C23G 1/20 (2006.01); G03F 7/42 (2006.01); H01L 21/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01); H01L 21/308 (2006.01); H01L 21/3105 (2006.01); H01L 21/321 (2006.01); H01L 21/3213 (2006.01); C11D 7/34 (2006.01); H01L 21/306 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/02071 (2013.01); B08B 3/08 (2013.01); B24B 37/042 (2013.01); C09D 9/00 (2013.01); C11D 3/30 (2013.01); C11D 3/43 (2013.01); C11D 7/06 (2013.01); C11D 7/263 (2013.01); C11D 7/265 (2013.01); C11D 7/267 (2013.01); C11D 7/32 (2013.01); C11D 7/3209 (2013.01); C11D 7/3218 (2013.01); C11D 7/3227 (2013.01); C11D 7/3245 (2013.01); C11D 7/3254 (2013.01); C11D 7/3263 (2013.01); C11D 7/3272 (2013.01); C11D 7/3281 (2013.01); C11D 7/5013 (2013.01); C11D 11/0029 (2013.01); C11D 11/0047 (2013.01); C23F 3/06 (2013.01); C23G 1/00 (2013.01); C23G 1/103 (2013.01); C23G 1/205 (2013.01); G03F 7/42 (2013.01); G03F 7/423 (2013.01); G03F 7/425 (2013.01); H01L 21/0206 (2013.01); H01L 21/02065 (2013.01); H01L 21/02074 (2013.01); H01L 21/3212 (2013.01); C11D 7/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836045 A1 19980820; AT 244751 T 20030715; DE 69816219 D1 20030814; DE 69816219 T2 20040422; EP 0909311 A1 19990421; EP 0909311 A4 20010228; EP 0909311 B1 20030709; JP 2001500922 A 20010123; JP 3850039 B2 20061129; KR 100355212 B1 20021226; KR 20000064914 A 20001106; TW 396202 B 20000701; US 5981454 A 19991109; US 6156661 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140214

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-02-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-10-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69816219

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 11D 3/18 A, 7C 11D 3/30 B, 7C 11D 3/04 B, 7C 11D 3/44 B, 7B 08B 3/08 B, 7C 11D 7/06 B, 7C 11D 7/26 B, 7C 11D 7/28 B, 7C 11D 7/32 B, 7C 23F 3/06 B, 7C 23G 1/00 B, 7H 01L 21/3105 B, 7H 01L 21/321 B, 7H 01L 21/3213 B

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981015

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU