Global Patent Index - EP 0909320 A4

EP 0909320 A4 2004-12-01 - CHEMOKINE beta-15

Title (en)

CHEMOKINE beta-15

Title (de)

CHEMOKIN beta-15

Title (fr)

CHEMOKINE beta-15

Publication

EP 0909320 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96922504 A

Priority

  • CA 2258507 A
  • US 9610561 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748807A1] The present invention concerns a member of the human chemokine CC protein family. In particular, isolated nucleic acid molecules are provided encoding the chemokine beta -15 protein. Chemokine beta -15 polypeptides are also provided. The invention further concerns diagnostic methods for detecting thymus disorders and therapeutic methods for modulating bone marrow cell proliferation and differentiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/19; A61K 38/19; C07K 14/52; C07K 16/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/19 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/523 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] YOUN BYUNG-S ET AL: "A Novel Chemokine, Macrophage Inflammatory Protein-Related Protein-2, Inhibits Colony Formation of Bone Marrow Myeloid Progenitors", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 155, no. 5, 1995, pages 2661 - 2667, XP002298771, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 23 March 1996 (1996-03-23), L. HILLIER ET AL: "za74f04.s1 Homo sapiens cDNA clone 298303 3'", XP002298772, retrieved from EBI, HINXTON; UK Database accession no. HS958307
  • See also references of WO 9748807A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748807 A1 19971224; AU 6335896 A 19980107; AU 738116 B2 20010906; CA 2258507 A1 19971224; EP 0909320 A1 19990421; EP 0909320 A4 20041201; HU 9903711 A2 20000328; HU 9903711 A3 20011228; IL 127551 D0 19991028; JP 2000515733 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060314

2004-12-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041015

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990115

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE