Global Patent Index - EP 0909353 B1

EP 0909353 B1 2001-05-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS COOKING OF PULP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS COOKING OF PULP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN ZELLSTOFFKOCHUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON CONTINUE DE PATE

Publication

EP 0909353 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98903344 A

Priority

  • SE 9800225 W
  • SE 9700192 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835090A1] This invention relates to a new and improved way of continuously cooking fibre material, wherein temperatures and alkaline levels are controlled to be maintained within specific levels in different zones of the digesting process in order to optimise chemical consumption and heat-economy and at the same time achieve very good pulp properties. The fibre material is heated and impregnated by the aid of black liquor to a temperature less than 140 DEG C and passed in con-current in an impregnation zone (A). The heated and impregnated fibre material is transferred to a con-current cooking zone (B) in the upper part of a digester (6). At least 60 % of the quantity of liquor (F) required for the cooking reaction is supplied in the up-stream end of the con-current cooking zone (B) in order to obtain a level of effective alkali exceeding 35 g/l. The cooking temperature in the con-current cooking zone (B) is lower than 160 DEG C. Spent liquor (E), with an amount of effective alkali of at least 13 g/l, is withdrawn from a strainer girdle (8). A substantial part of the spent liquor is supplied to the impregnation zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 3/02; D21C 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 3/02 (2006.01); D21C 3/22 (2006.01); D21C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 3/22 (2013.01); D21C 3/02 (2013.01); D21C 3/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835090 A1 19980813; AT 201064 T 20010515; AU 2183697 A 19980826; CA 2279283 A1 19980813; CA 2279283 C 20080826; DE 69800767 D1 20010613; DE 69800767 T2 20011129; EP 0909353 A1 19990421; EP 0909353 B1 20010509; ES 2159175 T3 20010916; ZA 9800936 B 19980923

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-21 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2007-05-31 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20070522

2007-05-30 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070316

2007-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-25 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020209

2002-04-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ INC.

- Effective date: 20020211

2002-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020209

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159175 T3

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800767 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201064 T 20010515

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990617

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980407

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI NL PT SE