Global Patent Index - EP 0909370 B1

EP 0909370 B1 2000-03-01 - REGENERATIVE PREHEATER

Title (en)

REGENERATIVE PREHEATER

Title (de)

REGENERATIVER VORWÄRMER

Title (fr)

PRECHAUFFEUR D'AIR A REGENERATION

Publication

EP 0909370 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97932250 A

Priority

  • US 9710876 W
  • US 67436196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800680A1] A rotary regenerative air preheater (10) having a linear scan hot spot detection system (38). This linear scan hot spot detection system (38) has a linear rail assembly (44) generally extending from the center to the periphery of the rotor (14) cavity. The rail assembly (44) preferably supports two carriage assemblies (54) for linear motion thereon. A drive mechanism (58) located on the exterior wall of the air preheater (10) shuttles the carriages (54) between the central portion and the peripheral portion of the rotor (14) cavity. Each carriage assembly (54) supports a single infrared sensor assembly head (66) for detecting hot spots on the air preheater rotor (14). The linear reciprocating motion of the two carriages (54) results in complete detection coverage for the rotating air preheater rotor (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 27/00; F28D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/04 (2006.01); F28F 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 27/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800680 A1 19980108; AU 3575997 A 19980121; AU 722667 B2 20000810; BR 9710863 A 19990817; CA 2260193 A1 19980108; DE 69701361 D1 20000406; DE 69701361 T2 20000921; EP 0909370 A1 19990421; EP 0909370 B1 20000301; ES 2145617 T3 20000701; ID 18888 A 19980520; JP H11514080 A 19991130; KR 20000022291 A 20000425; TW 347461 B 19981211; US 5791400 A 19980811; ZA 9705815 B 19980130

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030711

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020623

2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-07-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-07-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-06-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-06-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-06-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020623

2002-04-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-06-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010622

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010327

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145617 T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701361 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990531

1999-06-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REGENERATIVE PREHEATER

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981211

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE