Global Patent Index - EP 0909405 B1

EP 0909405 B1 2002-09-11 - INTERLOCKING FEATURE FOR A LINER AND A CONTAINER FOR USE WITH PHOTOSENSITIVE MEDIA

Title (en)

INTERLOCKING FEATURE FOR A LINER AND A CONTAINER FOR USE WITH PHOTOSENSITIVE MEDIA

Title (de)

BLOCKIERSYSTEM FÜR EINE HÜLLE UND EINE KASSETTE ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT LICHTEMPFINDLICHES MATERIAL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE BLOCAGE POUR UNE GARNITURE ET UN MAGASIN A UTILISER AVEC DES SUPPORTS PHOTOSENSIBLES

Publication

EP 0909405 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97928983 A

Priority

  • US 9710438 W
  • US 67686096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800755A1] A container (10) and liner (19) combination includes an interlock feature (80). Multiple sheets of photosensitive material (18) are placed on the liner (19). The container (10) has a base (16) in which the liner (19) is positioned. The base (16) has an interlock feature (80) and the liner (19) has a mating interlock feature (76). The interlock feature (80) prevents movement of the liner (19) in the feed direction as well as in a direction opposite the feed direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 42/04; B65H 1/04; B65H 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/26 (2006.01); G03B 42/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/266 (2013.01); G03B 42/045 (2013.01); B65H 2405/1136 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800755 A1 19980108; AU 3312097 A 19980121; DE 69715412 D1 20021017; DE 69715412 T2 20030528; EP 0909405 A1 19990421; EP 0909405 B1 20020911; JP 2000514203 A 20001024; JP 3899130 B2 20070328; US 5765091 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070616

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060616

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-05-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715412 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010810

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT