Global Patent Index - EP 0909440 B1

EP 0909440 B1 2000-10-18 - STICK FOR A STRING INSTRUMENT BOW AND PROCESSES FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (en)

STICK FOR A STRING INSTRUMENT BOW AND PROCESSES FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (de)

STANGE FÜR EINEN STREICHINSTRUMENT-BOGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN STANGE

Title (fr)

BAGUETTE POUR UN ARCHET D'INSTRUMENT A CORDES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE TELLE BAGUETTE

Publication

EP 0909440 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928045 A

Priority

  • AT 9700148 W
  • AT 118096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801846A1] This invention concerns a stick (1) for a string instrument bow containing fiber-reinforced plstic and designed to receive a frog and for attaching hairing; to produce a light, stiff bow for modified playing technique, the product of the mass of the stick alone (1) in grams times the deflection (D) which provides a measure of the stiffness of the stick alone in mm, when the stick (1) is pressed on in the handle area at the end of the stick (at 3) on the exterior side opposite the haired side and at a distance of 130 mm therefrom (at 4) on the haired or inner side, and when a force (F) is applied at the head end (5) corresponding to a mass of 300 g, is, in the case of violin and viola bows at most 1000 mm.g, preferably at most 800 mm.g, in the case of a cello bow at most 700 mm.g, preferably at most 550 mm.g, and in the case of a double bass bow at most 600 mm.g, preferably at most 450 mm.g.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801846 A1 19980115; AT 197100 T 20001115; AT 405223 B 19990625; AT A118096 A 19981015; AU 3247397 A 19980202; DE 59702505 D1 20001123; DK 0909440 T3 20010226; EP 0909440 A1 19990421; EP 0909440 B1 20001018; ES 2153203 T3 20010216; JP 2000513828 A 20001017; JP 4129650 B2 20080806; US 6075188 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100702

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702505

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-28 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WETZLINGER ANDREAS

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-12-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090820 AND 20090826

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BERND MUESING

- Free text: WETZLINGER, ANDREAS#SEEGASSE 5/12#1090 WIEN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- BERND MUESING#KARDINAL-DOEPFNER-PLATZ 1#97070 WUERZBURG (DE)

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080801

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153203 T3

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702505 20001123

2000-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197100 T 20001115

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990920

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990119

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE