Global Patent Index - EP 0909580 A3

EP 0909580 A3 2000-02-23 - Apparatus and method for introducing gases into liquids

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for introducing gases into liquids

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Einführen von Gasen in Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour l'introduction de gaz dans des liquides

Publication

EP 0909580 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119816 A

Priority

DE 19746044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909580A2] The pusher unit (5) is provided with a button (8) which can be manually activated. In a non activated state this button prevents operation of the pusher unit. In an activated state it frees the pusher unit so that the latter is operable for opening of the filler valve and introduction of pressurized gas into the liquid container. The claimed method involves activation of the button (8) before the pusher unit (5) can be operated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/047 (2013.01); B01F 3/04794 (2013.01); B01F 13/0033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909580 A2 19990421; EP 0909580 A3 20000223; DE 19746044 C1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AQUABAR GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FELL, BENNO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI