Global Patent Index - EP 0909587 A3

EP 0909587 A3 2000-12-06 - Nozzle manifold for an apparatus generating liquid jets

Title (en)

Nozzle manifold for an apparatus generating liquid jets

Title (de)

Düsenbalken an einer Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Flüssigkeitsstrahlen

Title (fr)

Support de buses pour un dispositif projetant des jets de liquide

Publication

EP 0909587 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119283 A

Priority

DE 19745661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909587A2] The jet beam assembly has a U-shaped mounting groove (12'') along the lower section to hold the lower part of the jet plate. The groove is larger than the diameter of the O-ring (12) at the end sides of the jet beam, towards the end sides. The spacers (29,30) for the O-ring, at the longitudinal plate, are fixed to the longitudinal plate (27) with a space between them which is beyond the end position of the O-ring in the lower section. At the end of the jet beam, the dimensions of the mounting groove match at least the size of the associated spacer (29,30) including the clamped O-ring on it, on the plane of the O-ring. The end of the mounting groove is open to the end, on the plane of the laid O-ring, at least at an end of the jet beam. The gap between the spacers (29,30), along the longitudinal plate (27), is larger than the final position of the O-ring in the mounting groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/20; B05B 15/06; D04H 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/20 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01); D04H 17/00 (2006.01); D04H 18/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2013.01); B05B 15/065 (2013.01); B05B 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909587 A2 19990421; EP 0909587 A3 20001206; EP 0909587 B1 20030122; DE 19745661 A1 19990422; JP H11200222 A 19990727; US 6012654 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806987 P 20030227

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05B 1/20 A, 7D 04H 1/46 B, 7B 05B 15/06 B

1999-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEISSNER GMBH & CO. KG MASCHINENFABRIK

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI