Global Patent Index - EP 0909596 A3

EP 0909596 A3 2001-03-14 - Device for uncoiling strips

Title (en)

Device for uncoiling strips

Title (de)

Abhaspelvorrichung zum Abhaspeln eines Bandes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déroulage de bandes

Publication

EP 0909596 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118626 A

Priority

DE 19745653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909596A2] The roller table comprises at least one base frame (6) with lower drive and locating roller (8) and a top frame (7) with upper drive roller (10) having drive axle (11) and with locating roller (12). Coil opener (13) for opening the coil (3) is provided on the coil side of the top frame, which is capable of moving on to the unwinder (1). Opener can preferably be moved between inoperative and operative positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/18 (2006.01); B21C 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/18 (2013.01); B21C 47/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 101 (M - 076) 30 June 1981 (1981-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 424 (M - 761) 10 November 1988 (1988-11-10)
  • [DA] HÜSKEN & HERWIG: "einsatz der coilbox in der warmbreitbandstrasse", STAHL UND EISEN, no. 7, 1983, pages 295 - 300, XP000978606

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909596 A2 19990421; EP 0909596 A3 20010314; DE 19745653 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FI FR GB

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981001

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI