Global Patent Index - EP 0909703 B1

EP 0909703 B1 2003-06-04 - Ship's rudder

Title (en)

Ship's rudder

Title (de)

Steuerruder für Wasserfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Gouvernail pour bateaux

Publication

EP 0909703 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250358 A

Priority

DE 19746711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909703A2] In the side surfaces (12,13) of the rudder blade (1) outlet apertures (3) are arranged for a fluid and/or gas-form medium. The outlet apertures are provided in the front third of the rudder blade in the direction of travel of the vessel. Further outlet apertures are distributed over the side surfaces of the rudder blade. They comprise slots running vertically to the direction of travel of the vessel. The cross-sections of the outlet apertures and/or the outlet speed of the medium are controllable independently of each other on both side surfaces of the rudder blade. The outlet speed of the medium is variable by means of a feed device (5) arranged in the vessel and the medium is fed via a conduit (20) positioned over the rudder shaft (2) connecting the rudder blade with the hull of the vessel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 25/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/28 (2006.01); B63H 25/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/38 (2013.01); B63B 1/288 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909703 A2 19990421; EP 0909703 A3 20010829; EP 0909703 B1 20030604; DE 19746711 A1 19990422; NO 984812 A 19990419; NO 984812 D0 19981015

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-19 [REG NL PLED] PLEDGE ESTABLISHED

- Effective date: 20111010

2009-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MARIFIN BEHEER B.V.

- Effective date: 20090612

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808597 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT NL

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT NL

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI