Global Patent Index - EP 0909722 B1

EP 0909722 B1 2002-09-18 - Filling device for filling a dispensing container and refillable dispensing container

Title (en)

Filling device for filling a dispensing container and refillable dispensing container

Title (de)

Befüllgerät zum Befüllen eines Ausgabebehälters und wiederbefüllbarer Ausgabebehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de remplissage d'un récipient de distribution ainsi que récipient de distribution rechargeable

Publication

EP 0909722 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123881 A

Priority

  • DE 4400062 A
  • DE 4429161 A
  • EP 94120805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0906872A1] The second (8) of the two valves (5,8) for filling the container (1) takes fluid and pressurised gas. The filler valve (8) is situated on the bottom (7) of the container. The container, such as can, is placed on a filler pipe (9) which is pref. in the form of a valve opened by the filler valve. The top dispenser valve is immovably fixed to the container. A surface part of the container acts as control for an on-off valve (15) for a filler appliance (2). A metering container (11) has a filler pipe (10) leading from the outlet or bottom to the filler pipe. A pressurised gas appliance (14-16) is connected to the dispenser container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14; B65B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/42 (2013.01); B65B 31/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4429161 A1 19950706; EP 0906872 A1 19990407; EP 0906872 B1 20011031; EP 0909722 A1 19990421; EP 0909722 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121229

2014-03-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140307

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59410184

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224330 T

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-07-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130701

2013-01-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Document: AT 224330 T

- Effective date: 20121128

2012-10-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121004 AND 20121010

2012-09-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-05-30 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120529

2012-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG

- Free text: ADOLF WUERTH GMBH & CO. KG#REINHOLD-WUERTH-STRASSE 12-16#74653 KUENZELSAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG#ASPERMONTSTRASSE 1#7000 CHUR (CH)

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-02-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090703

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2009-07-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ADOLF *WURTH G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-08-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1019579

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051228

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-16 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-12-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-12-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185105 T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021217

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404094

2003-01-27 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-12-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20021227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20021220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59410184 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 662431

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224330 T 20021015

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADOLF WUERTH GMBH & CO. KG

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990901

1999-04-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 662431

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE