Global Patent Index - EP 0909738 A3

EP 0909738 A3 2001-05-16 - Sling system for sack lifting

Title (en)

Sling system for sack lifting

Title (de)

Schlinge zum Heben von Säcken

Title (fr)

Elinge pour lever des sacs

Publication

EP 0909738 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203419 A

Priority

ES 9702162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909738A2] This system enables use thereof in automatic palletizing machines and stocking of the package of sacks arranged on the modular structure of the already slung pallet. It has a modular, flat, stackable structure arranged in boxes, where the vacuum gage of the palletizing machines takes them individually to move them and deposit them inside the automatic palletizing machine. This modular structure includes a polypropylene band (1) folded like a clover sandwiched between two surfaces or sheets of cardboard or the like (5) fastened by thermo-meltable glue, also having inside a porex plate upon which stably rests the top sheet of cardboard (5). From these angular areas emerge portions of the band that materialize respective handles (6) to allow extension of the lifting branches of the formed package. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909738 A2 19990421; EP 0909738 A3 20010516; ES 2152789 A1 20010201; ES 2152789 B1 20010901; NO 984862 A 19990419; NO 984862 D0 19981016

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI