Global Patent Index - EP 0909839 B1

EP 0909839 B1 2002-12-11 - Galvanic hard chromium layer

Title (en)

Galvanic hard chromium layer

Title (de)

Galvanische Hartchromschicht

Title (fr)

Couche de chrome dur galvanique

Publication

EP 0909839 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118677 A

Priority

DE 19745811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909839A1] A hard chromium electroplate, with an anodically widened crack network incorporating solid particles, comprises two or more layers having different crystalline forms. An Independent claim is also included for production of the above electroplate by (a) depositing a first hard chromium layer (2) onto a cathodically connected workpiece (1) using pulsed d.c. (preferably at 5-250 A/dm<2> current density) and a sulfuric acid plating electrolyte containing dispersed solid particles; (b) depositing a hard chromium coating (3) using constant d.c.; (c) connecting the workpiece as an anode so that the crack network (4) of the coating (3) is widened and filled with solid particles; and (d) repeating the above steps until the desired overall electroplate thickness is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 15/02; F16J 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 15/02 (2006.01); C25D 5/14 (2006.01); C25D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 15/02 (2013.01); C25D 5/14 (2013.01); C25D 5/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909839 A1 19990421; EP 0909839 B1 20021211; DE 19745811 A1 19990422; DE 19745811 C2 20020613; ES 2184184 T3 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101002

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101002

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184184 T3

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806614 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990914

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI