Global Patent Index - EP 0909844 A3

EP 0909844 A3 2000-05-24 - Sliver can stand

Title (en)

Sliver can stand

Title (de)

Spinnkannenstand

Title (fr)

Support de pots de filature

Publication

EP 0909844 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116705 A

Priority

DE 19740661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19740661A1] The arrangement of rectangular sliver cans, in each working row (1,2), has cans where the narrow sides of their rectangles match the radius of standard circular sliver cans, and their long sides are parallel to each other in the rectangle shape. Each sliver can (4) has an actual filled level which differs from its neighboring can (4) by a fraction of 0-1/1. A full can is positioned as a reserve at each point where there is a can with the least contents. The filled level of a can (4) differs from a neighboring can in the same or an adjacent row of cans (1,2) by 1/4, 1/2 or 3/4. Each row of cans (1,2) has only cans (4) with decreasing contents with two different content levels or only with the same level. Two rows (1,2) have cans (4) tightly packed together side by side. The reserve cans (5) are in a separate holding row (3) between the working rows (1,2), with a passage (7) between them for the movement of full and empty sliver cans as a connection to the preceding workstation and especially a drawing unit (11,12). The reserve row (3), with the long sides of the cans in parallel, has gaps (6) for an exchange between full and empty cans. Rows of reserve cans can be located next to each of the working rows (1,2) of cans, with their narrow sides against an axis parallel to the longitudinal axis of the flyer or jet spinner. The working and reserve cans can be exchanged in blocks. With four working rows of sliver cans, they are arranged as double rows with their reserve can rows and movement passages. The leading end of the sliver at each reserve can is placed at a defined position, to be located by an automatic sliver layer, at the narrow can side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19740661 A1 19990318; EP 0909844 A2 19990421; EP 0909844 A3 20000524; EP 0909844 B1 20030312; JP H11140728 A 19990525; US 5974630 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-02-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR IT LI

2003-03-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LANGEN, MANFRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LANGEN, MANFRED

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH ES FR IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR IT LI

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI