Global Patent Index - EP 0909852 B1

EP 0909852 B1 2002-09-04 - Tamping apparatus

Title (en)

Tamping apparatus

Title (de)

Stopfaggregat

Title (fr)

Appareil de bourrage

Publication

EP 0909852 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890251 A

Priority

AT 174097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909852A1] Tools (6) are mounted on a height-adjustable carrier (12) on which they can be pivoted by a hydraulic drive (16) that is connected to a supplementary drive (21). Drive is connected to one of the two link points (27) to the tools and the supplementary drive is mounted on a further link point (25). Preferably the supplementary drive is a hydraulic cylinder (24), parallel to the main drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909852 A1 19990421; EP 0909852 B1 20020904; AT 223537 T 20020915; AT A174097 A 19990115; AU 731270 B2 20010329; AU 8843698 A 19990506; CA 2250639 A1 19990414; CA 2250639 C 20051108; CN 1102977 C 20030312; CN 1214391 A 19990421; CZ 288290 B6 20010516; CZ 9802942 A3 19990512; DE 59805389 D1 20021010; DK 0909852 T3 20021111; ES 2182262 T3 20030301; JP 3980771 B2 20070926; JP H11200305 A 19990727; PL 191787 B1 20060731; PL 329087 A1 19990426; RU 2158796 C2 20001110; US 6067910 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-03-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130827

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130826

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130826

2014-05-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130826

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805389

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130826

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130827

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130826

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223537 T

- Effective date: 20130826

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-03-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-03-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANZ *PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN- INDUSTRIEG.- M.B.

- Effective date: 20130831

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182262 T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805389 20021010

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223537 T 20020915

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2000-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990825

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI