Global Patent Index - EP 0909884 B1

EP 0909884 B1 2001-02-07 - Pressure control valve

Title (en)

Pressure control valve

Title (de)

Druckregelungsventil

Title (fr)

Valve de contrôle de pression

Publication

EP 0909884 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890294 A

Priority

AT 175997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909884A1] Main body (4) of the valve spool (3) has a guide rod on which the piston (5) is displaceable in the axial direction. When respective predetermined oil pressures are exceeded in the first (6) and second (7) operating chambers, a control orifice (10) in each chamber is exposed by means of the same control edge. Preferably the chambers are separated by a collar (19) on the valve spool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 1/16; F01M 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/16 (2006.01); F01M 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/16 (2013.01); F01M 1/20 (2013.01); Y10T 137/263 (2015.04); Y10T 137/271 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909884 A1 19990421; EP 0909884 B1 20010207; AT 199106 T 20010215; AT A175997 A 20020215; DE 59800463 D1 20010315; ES 2154933 T3 20010416; US 6053195 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031014

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031013

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-10-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-10-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031013

2002-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154933 T3

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800463 20010315

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199106 T 20010215

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI