Global patent index - EP 0909886 A3

EP 0909886 A3 2000-09-06 - Position controller

Title (en)

Position controller

Title (de)

Stellungsregler

Title (fr)

Régulateur de position

Publication

EP 0909886 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117772 A

Priority

JP 28544297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909886A2] A position controller comprising: a step motor (20) which drives an apparatus (4); a reference position detection device (17) which detects that said apparatus (4) is located at a reference position and outputs a reference position detection signal; and a control device (40) which, based on the reference position detection signal from said reference position detection device (17), controls said step motor (20) so as to control a position of said apparatus (4), wherein, when said apparatus (4) is moved and said reference position detection device (17) is to be adjusted, said control device (17) drives said step motor (20) by an angle smaller than the regular angle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); G05D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/106 (2013.01); F02D 11/10 (2013.01); F02D 41/042 (2013.01); F02D 2250/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909886 A2 19990421; EP 0909886 A3 20000906; EP 0909886 B1 20031210; DE 69820379 D1 20040122; DE 69820379 T2 20041209; JP 3270726 B2 20020402; JP H11119832 A 19990430

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070918

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070918

2006-09-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060908

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69820379

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980918

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI