Global Patent Index - EP 0909898 A3

EP 0909898 A3 2000-02-02 - Compressed air maintenance unit

Title (en)

Compressed air maintenance unit

Title (de)

Druckluftwartungseinheit

Title (fr)

Unité d'entretien pour l'air comprimé

Publication

EP 0909898 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114404 A

Priority

DE 19746179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909898A2] The device has a number of modules (10-13), e.g. pressure regulators or filters, contained within respective module housings (15-18). The first module acts as a monitoring module for each of the other modules, with a bus line (42) of a bus system connecting the modules together. The monitoring module provides a control function via a central unit of the bus system, each other module provided with a bus subscriber station (39) coupled to sensors and/or actuators (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/26 (2006.01); F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F15B 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0853 (2013.01); F15B 1/26 (2013.01); F15B 13/0825 (2013.01); F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); F15B 13/086 (2013.01); F15B 13/0864 (2013.01); F15B 13/0867 (2013.01); F15B 13/0875 (2013.01); F15B 13/0892 (2013.01); F15B 13/0896 (2013.01); F15B 21/048 (2013.01); Y10T 307/25 (2015.04); Y10T 307/492 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

  • [DYA] WO 9638671 A1 19961205 - LORCH J GES & CO KG [DE], et al
  • [A] DE 9211109 U1 19921029
  • [A] WO 9705417 A1 19970213 - BRITISH GAS PLC [GB], et al
  • [A] DE 4032515 A1 19920416 - LORCH & CO KG J [DE]
  • [Y] MORLOK P: "DAS ABC DER DEZENTRALEN DRUCKLUFTAUFBEREITUNG", OLHYDRAULIK UND PNEUMATIK,DE,VEREINIGTE FACHVERLAGE, MAINZ, no. 8, pages 622-623, XP000198036, ISSN: 0341-2660
  • [A] VDI - GET: "Jahrbuch 1992", 1992, VDI-VERLAG, DÜSSELDORF, XP002124471
  • [A] VDI-GET: "Jahrbuch 1996", 1996, VDI-VERLAG, DÜSSELDORF, XP002124472

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909898 A2 19990421; EP 0909898 A3 20000202; EP 0909898 B1 20040204; DE 19746179 A1 19990429; DE 19746179 C2 19990819; HU 223031 B1 20040301; HU 9802244 A2 19990728; HU 9802244 A3 20000728; HU 9802244 D0 19981130; US 6169338 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810702

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130710

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810702 P 20040311

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021022

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI