Global Patent Index - EP 0909923 B1

EP 0909923 B1 2000-07-12 - Glow plug with bushing extension

Title (en)

Glow plug with bushing extension

Title (de)

Glühstiftkerze mit Büchseverlängerung

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence avec douille d'extension

Publication

EP 0909923 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830505 A

Priority

EP 97830505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909923A1] A glow plug for preheating Diesel engines consisting of a main body (12) and a tubular sheath element (24) projecting from one end (22) of the main body. The plug comprises a bushing (32), coaxial with the tubular sheath element (24), whose length (L1, L2) is selected according to the geometric characteristics it is desired to confer upon the plug. Also described is a method for producing an assortment of plugs with different geometric characteristics and/or thermal behaviours in which identical standard plugs are produced and then personalized and differentiated by the application of appropriate bushing pieces (24) onto the tubular sheath element (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909923 A1 19990421; EP 0909923 B1 20000712; DE 69702524 D1 20000817; DE 69702524 T2 20010308; ES 2150209 T3 20001116; SI 909923 T1 20001231

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-10-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-10-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-01-12 [REG IE NF4A] ORDER MADE FOR RESTORATION SECT. 37 PATENTS ACT 1992

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-11-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-22 [REG IE NE4A] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION SECT. 37 PATENTS ACT 1992

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011010

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150209 T3

2000-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001030

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-10-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001016

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001009

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702524 20000817

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990706

2000-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IE IT

2000-01-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990706

1999-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION S.P.A.

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION SPA

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980623

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI