Global Patent Index - EP 0909924 A3

EP 0909924 A3 2000-08-02 - Suspension for an annular gas turbine combustor

Title (en)

Suspension for an annular gas turbine combustor

Title (de)

Aufhängung einer ringförmigen Gasturbinen-Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Suspension d'une chambre de combustion annulaire de turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 0909924 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117869 A

Priority

DE 19745683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909924A2] The suspension is positioned in the outlet (4) part of the annular gas turbine combustion chamber (1) on a housing wall (7) by means of an annular bent arm structure (8) attached to the outer combustion chamber wall (9a). The arm has an outer and inner arm (8a,8b) in relation to the gas turbine's longitudinal axis (11). A flange (8c) fixed to the housing wall by means of a detachable connection (12) is attached to the outer arm (8b). At least one of the arms has passages (13) distributed over its periphery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/60; F23R 3/34; F23R 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/16 (2006.01); F23R 3/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/60 (2013.01); F01D 25/164 (2013.01); F05D 2230/642 (2013.01); F23R 2900/03041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909924 A2 19990421; EP 0909924 A3 20000802; EP 0909924 B1 20030716; DE 19745683 A1 19990422; US 6131384 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100921

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809015

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100921

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809015 P 20030821

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI