Global patent index - EP 0909934 A3

EP 0909934 A3 2000-05-31 - Method for cleaning water heating elements, in particular armoured resistance elements

Title (en)

Method for cleaning water heating elements, in particular armoured resistance elements

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reinigung von Heizelementen für Wasserheizer, insbesondere von geschützten Widerstandselementen

Title (fr)

Méthode de nettoyage d'éléments chauffants pour chauffe-eau, en particulier des éléments de résistance blindées

Publication

EP 0909934 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98119206 A

Priority

IT VE970045 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909934A2] A method for cleaning water heating elements, in particular armoured resistance elements (4), characterised in that the cleaning is carried out by mechanical abrasion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28G 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/00 (2006.01); F28G 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28G 3/04 (2013.01); F24H 9/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0909934 A2 19990421; EP 0909934 A3 20000531; IT 1297494 B1 19991217; IT VE970045 A1 19990419; IT VE970045 D0 19971017

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI