Global Patent Index - EP 0909996 A3

EP 0909996 A3 2002-12-18 - Clock/radio powered by solar energy

Title (en)

Clock/radio powered by solar energy

Title (de)

Solarbetriebene Funkuhr

Title (fr)

Montre radio alimentée par énergie solaire

Publication

EP 0909996 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119256 A

Priority

DE 29718454 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0909996A2] The solar-powered radio clock (11) has a power store (210 for operating inter alia an electromechanical transducer (15) for the time display (12). A step monitor (25) triggers an at least partial restart of the radio clock in the event of a shortened or interrupted drive pulse caused by an inadequate state of charge of the power store.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 10/02; G04C 3/14; G04G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 5/00 (2006.01); G04C 10/00 (2006.01); G04C 10/02 (2006.01); G04G 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 19/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718454 U1 19990211; EP 0909996 A2 19990421; EP 0909996 A3 20021218; JP H11160464 A 19990618; US 6205091 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1017930

2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 04C 10/02 A, 7G 04G 1/00 B, 7G 04C 3/14 B

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI