Global Patent Index - EP 0910258 B1

EP 0910258 B1 2001-12-05 - TOOTHBRUSH AND BRUSH HEAD FOR SAID TOOTHBRUSH

Title (en)

TOOTHBRUSH AND BRUSH HEAD FOR SAID TOOTHBRUSH

Title (de)

ZAHNBÜRSTE SOWIE BÜRSTENKOPF FÜR DIE ZAHNBÜRSTE

Title (fr)

BROSSE A DENTS ET TETE DE BROSSE ASSOCIEE

Publication

EP 0910258 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97921573 A

Priority

  • CH 9700209 W
  • CH 170596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801055A1] The invention relates to a replaceable brush head (4) of a toothbrush, said head having a bristle carrier (5) used to slide it onto a front section (3) of a handle (2). The two toothbrush sections (3, 5) can be joined together by lateral guide rails (34, 35) extending in the longitudinal direction of the toothbrush, and complementary longitudinal grooves (14, 15), and can be fixed in the longitudinal direction in an end position via resilient catches (37, 38). Centring members (22, 42) are associated with the two toothbrush sections (3, 5) and become wedged when the two toothbrush sections (3, 5) are joined together, and improve the hold of the brush head (4) on the handle (2) while cleaning teeth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801055 A1 19980115; BR 9710249 A 19990810; DE 59705675 D1 20020117; EP 0910258 A1 19990428; EP 0910258 B1 20011205; NO 990092 A 19990108; NO 990092 D0 19990108; US 6237183 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705675

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130526

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130526

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130506

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705675 20020117

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000803

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981016

1999-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI